+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor