+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Economic Development
- Read first time
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
- Read first time
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Davis, John
Type:
Primary Sponsor