+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/20/2021
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/29/2021
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Filed
- Record vote
- Permission to introduce
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor