+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/29/2021
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor