+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (63)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective on 1/1/22
- Filed without the Governor's signature
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/19/2021
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/21/2021
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
- Transmitted to the Governor
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor