+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Considered in public hearing
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On December 8, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor