+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/7/2019
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/13/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Filed