+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed without the Governor's signature
- Effective immediately
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/21/2021
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Reported engrossed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/20/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor