+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor