+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Insurance
- Read first time
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor