+ − Actions (83)
On June 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House appoints conferees
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Read 3rd time
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Vote reconsidered
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On December 22, 2008 in the House:
- Filed