+ − Actions (18)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor