+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
- Read 3rd time
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/16/2019
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/15/2019
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 3rd time
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Reported engrossed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amended
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/13/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Filed