+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/23/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor