+ − Actions (28)
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Filed