+ − Actions (32)
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On May 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor