+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor