+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/14/2021
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor