+ − Actions (59)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- See remarks for effective date
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor