+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor