+ − Actions (26)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Left pending in committee
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee members named
- Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Energy Resources
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor