+ − Actions (79)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Remarks ordered printed
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed as amended
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 18, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor