+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Administration
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor