+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/8/2019
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor