+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor