+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Withdrawn from calendar
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor