+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/18/2019
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor