+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/22/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Environmental Regulation
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed