+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor