+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/20/2021
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor