+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (63)
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- See remarks for effective date
On May 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Passed
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On December 10, 2010 in the House:
- Filed