+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/19/2021
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/6/2021
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor