+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (68)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House for further action
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate for further action
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed