+ − Actions (53)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Withdrawn from schedule
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On December 15, 2008 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor