+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/18/2021
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/15/2021
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed