+ − Actions (15)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 18, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor