+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 31, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On July 28, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On July 25, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On July 19, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor