+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (171)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- See remarks for effective date
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
- Remarks ordered printed
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House appoints conferees
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Natural Resources
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment as amended tabled
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order overruled
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment to amendment withdrawn
- Amendment to amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment amended
- Record vote
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amendment tabled
- Amendment withdrawn
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order overruled (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment as amended tabled
- Amendment tabled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Point of order sustained (amendment)
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Amended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment withdrawn
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment as amended withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amended
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment withdrawn
- Amendment tabled
- Record vote
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Calendars Committee rule adopted
- Rules suspended
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (57)
Type:
Primary Sponsor