+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Education
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On May 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed