+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Vote reconsidered
- 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor