+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On May 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/30/2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed