+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/21/2021
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/15/2021
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
- Read first time
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor