+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Removed from local & uncontested calendar
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Administration
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor