+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Criminal Justice
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor