+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Transmitted to the Governor
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor