+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Filed