+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Received from the House
- Referred to Transportation
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
- Record vote
- Permission to introduce
+ − Sponsors (3)
Gonzalez, Naomi
Type:
Primary Sponsor