+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Thompson, Senfronia
Type:
Primary Sponsor