+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor