+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Received from the House
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendations filed with the Speaker
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Governor
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor